AR SB123 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Notification that SB123 is now Act 602
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Notification that SB123 is now Act 602
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Set The Member Contribution Rate In The Arkansas Teacher Retirement System Between Six Percent (6%) And Seven Percent (7%) Of Salary Based On Actuarial Need And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Set The Member Contribution Rate In The Arkansas Teacher Retirement System Between Six Percent (6%) And Seven Percent (7%) Of Salary Based On Actuarial Need And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | Senate | Notification that SB123 is now Act 602 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2013-04-02 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-02 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-04-02 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-28 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2013-03-27 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Joint Committee on Public Retirement & Social Security Programs |
2013-02-19 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Re-referred to Joint Committee on Public Retirement & Social Security Programs |
2013-02-07 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Committee on Public Retirement & Social Security Programs |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Filed |