AR SB1003 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Notification that SB1003 is now Act 1283
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Notification that SB1003 is now Act 1283
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning The Duties And Responsibilities Of The Internal Audit Section Of The Department Of Finance And Administration.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning The Duties And Responsibilities Of The Internal Audit Section Of The Department Of Finance And Administration.
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan King [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 80 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 80 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | Senate | Notification that SB1003 is now Act 1283 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Returned From the House as passed as amended. |
2015-04-01 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2015-04-01 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-30 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-30 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-30 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-27 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2015-03-24 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2015-03-24 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2 |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2015-03-16 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Filed |