AR HR1049 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-27 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-27 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Affirming Traditional Marriage As Defined In Amendment 83 To The Constitution Of The State Of Arkansas And Federal Defense Of Marriage Act And Supporting The Federal Defense Of Marriage Act.
Title
Affirming Traditional Marriage As Defined In Amendment 83 To The Constitution Of The State Of Arkansas And Federal Defense Of Marriage Act And Supporting The Federal Defense Of Marriage Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Dotson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | House | READ AND ADOPTED. |
2013-03-25 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-25 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-25 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-22 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2013-03-12 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-03-11 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HR1049 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Bills/HR1049.pdf |