AR HR1038 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Raise Multiple Sclerosis Awareness And To Recognize The National Multiple Sclerosis Society.
Title
To Raise Multiple Sclerosis Awareness And To Recognize The National Multiple Sclerosis Society.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | House | READ AND ADOPTED. |
2015-03-27 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-03-17 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-17 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-17 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-05 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2015-03-05 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HR1038 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Bills/HR1038.pdf |