AR HR1036 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Encourage The United States Congress And The Arkansas Congressional Delegation To Approve The Keystone Xl Pipeline, Allow New Leases, And Remove Barriers To Future Energy Infrastructure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Encourage The United States Congress And The Arkansas Congressional Delegation To Approve The Keystone Xl Pipeline, Allow New Leases, And Remove Barriers To Future Energy Infrastructure.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22HouseREAD AND ADOPTED.
2021-04-19HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-04-19HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-04-19HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-04-15HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2021-04-12HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on ENERGY - JOINT
2021-04-12HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback