AR HR1036 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Rules Of The House Of Representatives Of The Ninety-second General Assembly.
Title
To Amend The Rules Of The House Of Representatives Of The Ninety-second General Assembly.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Dotson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - READ AND ADOPTED. (Y: 67 N: 11 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | READ AND ADOPTED. |
2019-04-09 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-04-09 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-04-09 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2019-02-27 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2019-02-27 | House | Filed |