AR HR1011 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-13)
Status: Passed on February 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Resolution received unanimous support.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-13)
Status: Passed on February 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Resolution received unanimous support.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Congratulate The Arkansas State University Red Wolves Football Team For Winning Back-t0-back Sun Belt Conference Championships And The 2013 Godaddy.com Bowl.
Title
To Congratulate The Arkansas State University Red Wolves Football Team For Winning Back-t0-back Sun Belt Conference Championships And The 2013 Godaddy.com Bowl.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-20 | House | Resolution received unanimous support. |
2013-02-20 | House | READ AND ADOPTED. |
2013-02-15 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-02-12 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-02-11 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HR1011 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Bills/HR1011.pdf |