AR HR1003 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-25 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-25 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Recognize And Celebrate Arkansas Forestry Day At The State Capitol On January 25, 2023.
Title
To Recognize And Celebrate Arkansas Forestry Day At The State Capitol On January 25, 2023.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-25 | House | READ AND ADOPTED. |
2023-01-24 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-01-23 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE MANAGEMENT |
2023-01-20 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?id=hr1003&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R |
Text | https://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHR1003.pdf |