AR HR1003 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-19 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-19 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Encourage Continued Collaboration Between Healthcare Providers, Law Enforcement, Educators, Public Officials, And The Arkansas Community In Battling The Abuse Of Prescription Drugs In Arkansas.
Title
To Encourage Continued Collaboration Between Healthcare Providers, Law Enforcement, Educators, Public Officials, And The Arkansas Community In Battling The Abuse Of Prescription Drugs In Arkansas.
Sponsors
Sen. Justin Boyd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-19 | House | READ AND ADOPTED. |
2017-01-17 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-01-12 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-01-12 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-01-12 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-01-09 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-01-09 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HR1003 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Bills/HR1003.pdf |