AR HJR1011 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
An Amendment To The Arkansas Constitution Concerning The Applicability Of Arkansas Constitution, Amendment 33, To Institutions Of Higher Learning.
Title
An Amendment To The Arkansas Constitution Concerning The Applicability Of Arkansas Constitution, Amendment 33, To Institutions Of Higher Learning.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | House | Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment |
2017-02-27 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-27 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-02-17 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-17 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-17 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-02-08 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HJR1011 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Bills/HJR1011.pdf |