AR HJR1003 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #6) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #6) [PDF]
Summary
An Amendment To The Arkansas Constitution Concerning Proposed Measures And Constitutional Amendments Considered By Voters At An Election.
Title
An Amendment To The Arkansas Constitution Concerning Proposed Measures And Constitutional Amendments Considered By Voters At An Election.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeremy Gillam [R] | Sen. Eddie Williams [R] | Rep. Andy Mayberry [R] | Sen. Bob Ballinger [R] |
Sen. Greg Leding [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - Senate - Read third time and failed to pass. (Y: 9 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-27 - House - Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 79 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 79 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Died on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The vote by which HJR 1003 FAILED was EXPUNGED. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Read third time and failed to pass. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-27 | House | Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-22 | House | Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-21 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-20 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 3 |
2017-03-13 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-13 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-13 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-02-21 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-21 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-21 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-02-08 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed |