AR HCR1014 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Proclaim April As Aarp™ Month At The State Capitol And To Proclaim April 5, 2023, As Aarp™ Day At The State Capitol.
Title
To Proclaim April As Aarp™ Month At The State Capitol And To Proclaim April 5, 2023, As Aarp™ Day At The State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2023-04-06 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2023-04-06 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2023-04-06 | House | Returned From Senate concurred in. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Returned To the House as concurred in. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Resolution read and concurred in. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-04-05 | House | Read the third time, concurred in, ordered transmitted to the Senate |
2023-04-03 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-04-03 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE MANAGEMENT |
2023-04-03 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?id=hcr1014&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R |
Text | https://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHCR1014.pdf |