AR HCR1012 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Proclaim The Month Of May As Bike Month In The State Of Arkansas.
Title
To Proclaim The Month Of May As Bike Month In The State Of Arkansas.
Sponsors
Rep. Delia Haak [R] | Sen. Bart Hester [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2023-05-01 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2023-05-01 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2023-05-01 | House | Returned From Senate concurred in. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Returned To the House as concurred in. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Resolution read and concurred in. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2023-03-30 | House | Read the third time, concurred in, ordered transmitted to the Senate |
2023-03-29 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2023-03-16 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2023-03-16 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?id=hcr1012&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R |
Text | https://arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FHCR1012.pdf |