AR HCR1005 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-16 - House Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-16 - House Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Adopt The Joint Rules Of The Senate And The House Of Representatives Of The Eighty-eighth General Assembly.
Title
To Adopt The Joint Rules Of The Senate And The House Of Representatives Of The Eighty-eighth General Assembly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-10 - House - Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-16 | House Approved by the Governor | |
2011-02-15 | House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. | |
2011-02-15 | House TO BE ENROLLED | |
2011-02-15 | House Returned From Senate concurred in. | |
2011-02-15 | Senate Returned To the House as concurred in. | |
2011-02-15 | Senate Resolution read and concurred in. | |
2011-02-14 | Senate Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. | |
2011-02-14 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-02-10 | House Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-02-09 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-02-07 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on House Select Committee on Rules | |
2011-02-07 | House Filed |