AR HCR1004 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide For An Extension Of The Regular Session Of The Ninetieth General Assembly; And To Provide For A Recess Of The General Assembly.
Title
To Provide For An Extension Of The Regular Session Of The Ninetieth General Assembly; And To Provide For A Recess Of The General Assembly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-11 - Senate - Resolution read and concurred in. (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-13 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2015-02-12 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2015-02-11 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2015-02-11 | House | Returned From Senate concurred in. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Returned To the House as concurred in. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Resolution read and concurred in. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-02-09 | House | Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-02-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2015-02-06 | House | Filed |