AR HCR1003 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 16 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Designate The Arkansaurus Fridayi As The Official State Dinosaur.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Designate The Arkansaurus Fridayi As The Official State Dinosaur.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-17HouseApproved by the Governor
2017-02-16HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2017-02-16HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2017-02-16SenateReturned To the House as concurred in.
2017-02-16SenateResolution read and concurred in.
2017-02-07SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2017-01-23SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
2017-01-23SenateReceived from the House.
2017-01-23HouseRead and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2017-01-19HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-01-19HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2017-01-19HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2017-01-18HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2017-01-10HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2017-01-10HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback