AR HB2240 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-18 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-18 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning Persons Employed By The State Of Arkansas.
Title
To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning Persons Employed By The State Of Arkansas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - House - The vote by which HB2240 Failed to Pass was expunged. (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 34 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 34 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-18 | House | Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-04-18 | House | WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR |
2013-04-17 | House | The vote by which HB2240 Failed to Pass was expunged. |
2013-04-17 | House | EXPUNGED |
2013-04-01 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2013-03-28 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-28 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-28 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-27 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2013-03-12 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-03-11 | House | Filed |