AR HB2175 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Notification that HB2175 is now Act 1011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Notification that HB2175 is now Act 1011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Repeal Archaic Language In Title 2 Of Arkansas Code; To Amend The Law Concerning The Arkansas Livestock And Poultry Commission; And To Amend The Law Concerning Control Of Contagious Diseases.
Title
To Repeal Archaic Language In Title 2 Of Arkansas Code; To Amend The Law Concerning The Arkansas Livestock And Poultry Commission; And To Amend The Law Concerning Control Of Contagious Diseases.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Douglas [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-07 | House | Notification that HB2175 is now Act 1011 |
2017-03-31 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-03-31 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-03-31 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2017-03-30 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2017-03-29 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE |
2017-03-29 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The vote by which HB 2175 PASSED was EXPUNGED. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Economic Development |
2017-03-27 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Economic Development |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-20 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-16 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-16 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-16 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-15 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2 |
2017-03-09 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-09 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-07 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |