AR HB2096 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Notification that HB2096 is now Act 1004
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Notification that HB2096 is now Act 1004
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Provisions Of Procurement Law To Reflect The Impact Of Inflation On The Cost Of Goods And Services And To Encourage More Participation By Small Businesses.
Title
To Amend Provisions Of Procurement Law To Reflect The Impact Of Inflation On The Cost Of Goods And Services And To Encourage More Participation By Small Businesses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-07 | House | Notification that HB2096 is now Act 1004 |
2017-03-31 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-03-30 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-03-30 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-27 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-23 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-23 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-21 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2017-03-07 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |