AR HB2055 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Study The Creation Of A School Of Agriculture And Technology And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Study The Creation Of A School Of Agriculture And Technology And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | House | Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2013-04-17 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-17 | House | Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-17 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-04-10 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-10 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-10 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-03-11 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HB2055 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Bills/HB2055.pdf |