AR HB2038 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-31 - House Notification that HB2038 is now Act 900
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-31 - House Notification that HB2038 is now Act 900
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Regarding Exceptions For Numbering Motorboats.
Title
To Amend The Law Regarding Exceptions For Numbering Motorboats.
Sponsors
Rep. John Vines [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-29 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-11 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-11 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-31 | House Notification that HB2038 is now Act 900 | |
2011-03-30 | House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. | |
2011-03-29 | House TO BE ENROLLED | |
2011-03-29 | House Returned From the Senate as passed. | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Returned to the House as passed. | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-03-15 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology and Legislative Affairs | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-03-11 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-10 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-03-07 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE | |
2011-03-07 | House Filed |