AR HB2037 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-08 - Notification that HB2037 is now Act 1006
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-08 - Notification that HB2037 is now Act 1006
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Provisions Of The Child Maltreatment Act.
Title
To Amend Provisions Of The Child Maltreatment Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | House | Notification that HB2037 is now Act 1006 |
2013-04-04 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-03 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-03-28 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-27 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-22 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-22 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-22 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-03-11 | House | Filed |