AR HB1998 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-05 - House Notification that HB1998 is now Act 1182
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-05 - House Notification that HB1998 is now Act 1182
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Clarify The Law Regarding The Lowering Of State Flags When A Member Of The Armed Services Is Killed In Action.
Title
To Clarify The Law Regarding The Lowering Of State Flags When A Member Of The Armed Services Is Killed In Action.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-05 | House Notification that HB1998 is now Act 1182 | |
2011-04-01 | House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. | |
2011-03-31 | House TO BE ENROLLED | |
2011-03-31 | House Returned From the Senate as passed. | |
2011-03-31 | Senate Returned to the House as passed. | |
2011-03-31 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-03-22 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-03-10 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-09 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-03-07 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE | |
2011-03-07 | House Filed |