AR HB1953 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in the House at Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in the House at Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Certain Provisions Of The Workers' Compensation Law That Resulted From Initiated Act No. 4 Of 1948.
Title
To Amend Certain Provisions Of The Workers' Compensation Law That Resulted From Initiated Act No. 4 Of 1948.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 61 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | House | Died in the House at Sine Die |
2017-03-22 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-03-20 | House | The vote by which HB1953 Failed to Pass was expunged. |
2017-03-20 | House | Motion by Rep. Collins to expunge the vote of HB1953 passed |
2017-03-20 | House | EXPUNGED |
2017-03-17 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-17 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-17 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-16 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2 |
2017-03-15 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-03-14 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-10 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-10 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-10 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |