AR HB1933 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning The Membership And Powers Of The Child Death And Near Fatality Multidisciplinary Review Committee; And To Amend The Expiration Date Of Acts 2015, No. 1245.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning The Membership And Powers Of The Child Death And Near Fatality Multidisciplinary Review Committee; And To Amend The Expiration Date Of Acts 2015, No. 1245.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-16 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-15 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |