AR HB1926 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-5)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-19 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-19 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Adjust The Income Levels Subject To Certain Income Tax Rates; And To Increase The Number Of Persons Entitled To Use The Low-income Tax Tables.
Title
To Adjust The Income Levels Subject To Certain Income Tax Rates; And To Increase The Number Of Persons Entitled To Use The Low-income Tax Tables.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-19 | House | Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2013-04-19 | House | WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR |
2013-03-28 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-28 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-28 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-22 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-22 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-22 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2013-03-11 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HB1926 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Bills/HB1926.pdf |