AR HB1913 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that HB1913 is now Act 1059
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that HB1913 is now Act 1059
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Long-term Care Aide Training Act; And To Specify Certain Requirements For Long-term Aide Training Programs.
Title
To Amend The Long-term Care Aide Training Act; And To Specify Certain Requirements For Long-term Aide Training Programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Notification that HB1913 is now Act 1059 |
2019-04-10 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-04-09 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-04-01 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-28 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-03-25 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-03-25 | House | Filed |