AR HB1902 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Notification that HB1902 is now Act 742
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Notification that HB1902 is now Act 742
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning Agricultural Schools; To Allow A Public Charter Authorizer To Designate A Public Charter School As A School For Agricultural Studies; And To Repeal The K-12 Agriculture School Pilot Program.
Title
Concerning Agricultural Schools; To Allow A Public Charter Authorizer To Designate A Public Charter School As A School For Agricultural Studies; And To Repeal The K-12 Agriculture School Pilot Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 78 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 78 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Notification that HB1902 is now Act 742 |
2017-03-27 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-03-23 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-03-23 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, and Economic Development |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-16 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-15 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE |
2017-03-03 | House | Filed |