AR HB1884 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Died in House at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Died in House at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Carrying Of A Concealed Handgun By A Concealed Handgun Licensee.
Title
Concerning The Carrying Of A Concealed Handgun By A Concealed Handgun Licensee.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim Hammer [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-23 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 20 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | House | Died in House at Sine Die adjournment. |
2015-03-23 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2015-03-20 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-03-17 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-03-17 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-17 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-17 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-09 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS |
2015-03-09 | House | Filed |