AR HB1883 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Notification that HB1883 is now Act 1091
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

The Working Animal Protection Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Working Animal Protection Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - Third Reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30HouseNotification that HB1883 is now Act 1091
2021-04-27HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2021-04-26HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2021-04-26HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2021-04-26SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2021-04-26SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-04-22SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-04-19SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT - SENATE
2021-04-19SenateReceived from the House.
2021-04-19HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-04-19HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-04-19HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-04-19HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-04-14HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
2021-04-13HouseRe-referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
2021-04-13HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-04-13HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-04-13HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-04-12HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-04-07HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
2021-04-07HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=hb1883&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1883/HB1883040720211009.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1883/HB1883041320211435.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/HB1883/HB1883041920210851.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2021R%2FPublic%2F&file=1091.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/HB1883-H1.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/HB1883-H2.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1883&rcs=2927&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=HB1883&rcs=3137&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R

Bill Comments 750

feedback