AR HB1883 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-04 - House Notification that HB1883 is now Act 1038
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-04 - House Notification that HB1883 is now Act 1038
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Allow An Exception To A Burn Ban To Burn Off A Crop Following Harvest.
Title
To Allow An Exception To A Burn Ban To Burn Off A Crop Following Harvest.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-04 | House Notification that HB1883 is now Act 1038 | |
2011-03-31 | House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. | |
2011-03-30 | House TO BE ENROLLED | |
2011-03-30 | House Returned From the Senate as passed. | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Returned to the House as passed. | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry and Economic Development | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-03-18 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-16 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-03-04 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE | |
2011-03-04 | House Filed |