AR HB1882 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-03 - Notification that HB1882 is now Act 799
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-03 - Notification that HB1882 is now Act 799
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
The Van Accessible Parking Act.
Title
The Van Accessible Parking Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 63 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 63 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-03 | House | Notification that HB1882 is now Act 799 |
2017-03-28 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-03-27 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-03-27 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology, and Legislative Affairs |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-15 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-14 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2017-03-02 | House | Filed |