AR HB1856 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that HB1856 is now Act 1057
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Prohibit State Agencies From Consenting Or Approving The Termination Of Pregnancy For An Individual In The Custody Or Guardianship Of The State And From Expending State Funds For The Purpose Of Terminating A Pregnancy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Prohibit State Agencies From Consenting Or Approving The Termination Of Pregnancy For An Individual In The Custody Or Guardianship Of The State And From Expending State Funds For The Purpose Of Terminating A Pregnancy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 75 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HouseNotification that HB1856 is now Act 1057
2019-04-10HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-09HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-09HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-04-09SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2019-04-09SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-04SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-26SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-26SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-26HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-25HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-25HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-25HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-20HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-03-18HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-03-18HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback