AR HB1852 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Notification that HB1852 is now Act 1252
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Notification that HB1852 is now Act 1252
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning Metal Transporter Plates Issued Under Arkansas Code § 27-14-1806.
Title
To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning Metal Transporter Plates Issued Under Arkansas Code § 27-14-1806.
Sponsors
Sen. John Payton [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | House | Notification that HB1852 is now Act 1252 |
2015-04-02 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2015-04-01 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2015-04-01 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology, and Legislative Affairs |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-03-18 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-17 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-03-12 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2015-03-12 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-12 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-12 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-09 | House | In accordance with House Rule 39 Read the first time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE JOURNAL; ENGROSSED AND ENROLLED BILLS |
2015-03-09 | House | Filed |