AR HB1825 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Notification that HB1825 is now Act 710
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Notification that HB1825 is now Act 710
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Provisions Of Title 6 Of The Arkansas Code Concerning Provisional Positions For State-supported Institutions Of Higher Education; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend Provisions Of Title 6 Of The Arkansas Code Concerning Provisional Positions For State-supported Institutions Of Higher Education; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Lane Jean [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | Notification that HB1825 is now Act 710 |
2019-04-02 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-04-01 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-04-01 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-03-25 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2019-03-25 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-03-19 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-03-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-03-14 | House | Filed |