AR HB1811 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that HB1811 is now Act 1048
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Concerning The Operation Of All-terrain Vehicles On Public Streets And Highways.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Concerning The Operation Of All-terrain Vehicles On Public Streets And Highways.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HouseNotification that HB1811 is now Act 1048
2019-04-10HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-09HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-09HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-04-09SenateReturned to the House as Passed.
2019-04-09SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-08SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-04-05SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
2019-04-05SenateReceived from the House.
2019-04-05HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-04-04HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-04-01HouseRe-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
2019-04-01HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-01HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-04-01HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-26HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-13HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
2019-03-13HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback