AR HB1808 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Exempt The State Capitol Grounds From The Elevator Safety Law.
Title
To Exempt The State Capitol Grounds From The Elevator Safety Law.
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Hyde [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-30 - House - Motion to transmit HB1808 to the Senate passed. (Y: 81 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - Motion to recall HB1808 from the Governor passed. (Y: 82 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 83 N: 3 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - Motion to recall HB1808 from the Governor passed. (Y: 82 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 83 N: 3 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Senate Sine Die adjournment | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Died on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment. | |
2011-03-31 | Senate The vote by which HB1808 passed on March 28 was EXPUNGED | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Returned From the House as requested. | |
2011-03-30 | House Return to the Senate. | |
2011-03-30 | House Returned from the Governor's office as requested. | |
2011-03-30 | House Motion to transmit HB1808 to the Senate passed. | |
2011-03-30 | House Motion to recall HB1808 from the Governor passed. | |
2011-03-29 | House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. | |
2011-03-28 | House TO BE ENROLLED | |
2011-03-28 | House Returned From the Senate as passed. | |
2011-03-28 | Senate Returned to the House as passed. | |
2011-03-28 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-03-18 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-17 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-03-02 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE | |
2011-03-02 | House Filed |