AR HB1799 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Notification that HB1799 is now Act 748
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Notification that HB1799 is now Act 748
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Automate The Review Of Abuse Registries Maintained By The Department Of Human Services.
Title
To Automate The Review Of Abuse Registries Maintained By The Department Of Human Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | House | Notification that HB1799 is now Act 748 |
2013-04-02 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-01 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-01 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-03-26 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-03-26 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-22 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-21 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-21 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-21 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-07 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-03-07 | House | Filed |