AR HB1753 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Minimum Wage Act Of The State Of Arkansas; And To Amend The Minimum Wage Resulting From Initiated Act 5 Of 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Minimum Wage Act Of The State Of Arkansas; And To Amend The Minimum Wage Resulting From Initiated Act 5 Of 2018.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 34 N: 42 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HouseDied on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
2019-04-01HouseRead the third time and failed.
2019-03-26HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-25HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-25HouseAmendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-25HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-19HouseRe-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-03-19HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-19HouseAmendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-19HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-14HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-03-14HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-03-14HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-03-12HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-03-11HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-03-07HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback