AR HB1738 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-31 - House Notification that HB1738 is now Act 880
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-31 - House Notification that HB1738 is now Act 880
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Prohibit The Distribution Of Insurance Premium Tax Moneys To Inactive Fire Departments.
Title
To Prohibit The Distribution Of Insurance Premium Tax Moneys To Inactive Fire Departments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-29 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-31 | House Notification that HB1738 is now Act 880 | |
2011-03-30 | House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. | |
2011-03-29 | House TO BE ENROLLED | |
2011-03-29 | House Returned From the Senate as passed. | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Returned to the House as passed. | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Rules suspended. | |
2011-03-28 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-03-24 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-23 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-03-22 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-22 | House Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-22 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-03-15 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-15 | House Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-15 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-02-28 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE | |
2011-02-28 | House Filed |