AR HB1737 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Notification that HB1737 is now Act 788
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Increase Certain Fees Associated With The Public Water System Service Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Increase Certain Fees Associated With The Public Water System Service Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 59 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseNotification that HB1737 is now Act 788
2019-04-04HouseCorrectly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
2019-04-03HouseTO BE ENROLLED
2019-04-03HouseReturned From the Senate as passed.
2019-04-03SenateReturned to the House as passed.
2019-04-03SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-02SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-26SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-26SenateReceived from the House.
2019-03-25HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-03-20HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-03-07HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-03-07HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback