AR HB1719 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-3)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-3)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
To Create The Reboot Pilot Program; And To Create An Income Tax Credit For Businesses That Hire Certain Former Offenders.
Title
To Create The Reboot Pilot Program; And To Create An Income Tax Credit For Businesses That Hire Certain Former Offenders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - Third Reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-04-19 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-19 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-19 | House | Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-19 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-15 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 3 |
2021-04-07 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-07 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-05 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-05 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-05 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed |