AR HB1699 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-08 - Notification that HB1699 is now Act 991
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-08 - Notification that HB1699 is now Act 991
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide For The Creation And Issuance Of A Special License Plate And Special Motorcycle License Plate For Members Of Veterans Of Foreign Wars.
Title
To Provide For The Creation And Issuance Of A Special License Plate And Special Motorcycle License Plate For Members Of Veterans Of Foreign Wars.
Sponsors
Rep. John Vines [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 83 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 83 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | House | Notification that HB1699 is now Act 991 |
2013-04-05 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-04 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-04 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology and Legislative Affairs |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-04-01 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-28 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-20 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-20 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2013-03-05 | House | Filed |