AR HB1694 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - Notification that HB1694 is now Act 479
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - Notification that HB1694 is now Act 479
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Use Of An Interlock Device For Persons Charged With Driving While Intoxicated.
Title
Concerning The Use Of An Interlock Device For Persons Charged With Driving While Intoxicated.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeremy Gillam [R] | Sen. Jon Woods [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-19 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | House | Notification that HB1694 is now Act 479 |
2013-03-20 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-03-19 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-03-19 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-03-11 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-07 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-05 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-03-05 | House | Filed |