AR HB1676 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-06 - Notification that HB1676 is now Act 1092
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-06 - Notification that HB1676 is now Act 1092
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Prohibit Re-homing Of An Adopted Child.
Title
To Prohibit Re-homing Of An Adopted Child.
Sponsors
Rep. David Meeks [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - House - Senate amendment # 2 read and concurred in. (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-06 | House | Notification that HB1676 is now Act 1092 |
2015-03-31 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2015-03-31 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2015-03-31 | House | Senate amendment # 2 read and concurred in. |
2015-03-31 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2015-03-30 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 and 2 |
2015-03-26 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-03-26 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 and 2. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Amendment # 1 and #2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 & #2 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-03-20 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-18 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-18 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-17 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2 |
2015-03-13 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-13 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-13 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-05 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-03-05 | House | Filed |