AR HB1663 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Notification that HB1663 is now Act 1248
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-08 - Notification that HB1663 is now Act 1248
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Various Provisions Of The Arkansas Code Concerning Public School Funding Amounts; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend Various Provisions Of The Arkansas Code Concerning Public School Funding Amounts; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - Motion to reconsider concurrence with Senate Amendment No. 1 to HB1663 passed. (Y: 82 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - Failed to concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 (Y: 45 N: 27 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 84 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - Motion to reconsider concurrence with Senate Amendment No. 1 to HB1663 passed. (Y: 82 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - Failed to concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 (Y: 45 N: 27 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 84 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | House | Notification that HB1663 is now Act 1248 |
2015-04-02 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2015-04-01 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2015-04-01 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2015-04-01 | House | Motion to reconsider concurrence with Senate Amendment No. 1 to HB1663 passed. |
2015-04-01 | House | Failed to concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2015-03-31 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2015-03-30 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-03-30 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-03-16 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-03-16 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-12 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-03-05 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-03-05 | House | Filed |