AR HB1652 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-06 - Notification that HB1652 is now Act 1091
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-06 - Notification that HB1652 is now Act 1091
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Provisions Of The Arkansas Code Concerning The Teacher Excellence And Support System.
Title
To Amend Provisions Of The Arkansas Code Concerning The Teacher Excellence And Support System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-06 | House | Notification that HB1652 is now Act 1091 |
2015-03-31 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2015-03-30 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2015-03-30 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-03-20 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-19 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-03-05 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-03-05 | House | Filed |