AR HB1631 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-29 - House Notification that HB1631 is now Act 758
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-29 - House Notification that HB1631 is now Act 758
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding The Possession Of Handguns.
Title
Regarding The Possession Of Handguns.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-25 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-29 | House Notification that HB1631 is now Act 758 | |
2011-03-25 | House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. | |
2011-03-25 | House TO BE ENROLLED | |
2011-03-25 | House Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. | |
2011-03-24 | House Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 | |
2011-03-21 | House Re-referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE | |
2011-03-21 | House Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Returned To the House as passed as amended. | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-03-17 | Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-17 | Senate Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-03-09 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-08 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-02-28 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE | |
2011-02-28 | House Filed |