AR HB1629 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in the House at Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Protect Victims Of Domestic Abuse; And Prohibiting A Person Convicted Of Misdemeanor Domestic Battering From Possessing A Firearm.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Protect Victims Of Domestic Abuse; And Prohibiting A Person Convicted Of Misdemeanor Domestic Battering From Possessing A Firearm.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-27 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 31 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-01HouseDied in the House at Sine Die
2017-03-27HouseRead the third time and failed.
2017-03-23HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-03-23HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2017-03-23HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2017-03-21HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2017-02-21HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2017-02-21HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback