AR HB1596 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Require A School District To Provide Up To Ten (10) Legislative Days Per School Year Per School District.
Title
To Require A School District To Provide Up To Ten (10) Legislative Days Per School Year Per School District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-17 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 53 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | House | Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-03-17 | House | Clincher motion failed of adoption. |
2015-03-17 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-11 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-11 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-10 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2015-03-03 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-03-03 | House | Filed |